|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 3147.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2563.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1520.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|