California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill June 3, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019