Enrolled September 12, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019 Amended IN Senate June 03, 2019 Amended IN Assembly April 22, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1394Introduced by Assembly Member DalyFebruary 22, 2019 An act to add Section 781.1 to, and to repeal Section 903.3 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1394, Daly. Juveniles: sealing of records.Existing law authorizes, with exceptions, a person who is the subject of a juvenile court record, or the county probation officer, to petition the court for the sealing of records relating to the persons case. Existing law establishes the procedures that apply to the sealing of those records.This bill would prohibit a superior court or probation department from charging an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under those provisions.Existing law makes a person who is 26 years of age or older, unless indigent, liable for the cost to the county and court for an investigation related to the sealing of juvenile court or arrest records pertaining to that person. Existing law sets forth certain exceptions and reimbursement terms.This bill would delete the persons liability for those costs.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 781.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:781.1. A superior court or probation department shall not charge an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under Section 781.SEC. 2. Section 903.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed. Enrolled September 12, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019 Amended IN Senate June 03, 2019 Amended IN Assembly April 22, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1394Introduced by Assembly Member DalyFebruary 22, 2019 An act to add Section 781.1 to, and to repeal Section 903.3 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1394, Daly. Juveniles: sealing of records.Existing law authorizes, with exceptions, a person who is the subject of a juvenile court record, or the county probation officer, to petition the court for the sealing of records relating to the persons case. Existing law establishes the procedures that apply to the sealing of those records.This bill would prohibit a superior court or probation department from charging an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under those provisions.Existing law makes a person who is 26 years of age or older, unless indigent, liable for the cost to the county and court for an investigation related to the sealing of juvenile court or arrest records pertaining to that person. Existing law sets forth certain exceptions and reimbursement terms.This bill would delete the persons liability for those costs.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Enrolled September 12, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019 Amended IN Senate June 03, 2019 Amended IN Assembly April 22, 2019 Enrolled September 12, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019 Amended IN Senate June 03, 2019 Amended IN Assembly April 22, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1394 Introduced by Assembly Member DalyFebruary 22, 2019 Introduced by Assembly Member Daly February 22, 2019 An act to add Section 781.1 to, and to repeal Section 903.3 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1394, Daly. Juveniles: sealing of records. Existing law authorizes, with exceptions, a person who is the subject of a juvenile court record, or the county probation officer, to petition the court for the sealing of records relating to the persons case. Existing law establishes the procedures that apply to the sealing of those records.This bill would prohibit a superior court or probation department from charging an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under those provisions.Existing law makes a person who is 26 years of age or older, unless indigent, liable for the cost to the county and court for an investigation related to the sealing of juvenile court or arrest records pertaining to that person. Existing law sets forth certain exceptions and reimbursement terms.This bill would delete the persons liability for those costs. Existing law authorizes, with exceptions, a person who is the subject of a juvenile court record, or the county probation officer, to petition the court for the sealing of records relating to the persons case. Existing law establishes the procedures that apply to the sealing of those records. This bill would prohibit a superior court or probation department from charging an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under those provisions. Existing law makes a person who is 26 years of age or older, unless indigent, liable for the cost to the county and court for an investigation related to the sealing of juvenile court or arrest records pertaining to that person. Existing law sets forth certain exceptions and reimbursement terms. This bill would delete the persons liability for those costs. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 781.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:781.1. A superior court or probation department shall not charge an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under Section 781.SEC. 2. Section 903.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Section 781.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read:781.1. A superior court or probation department shall not charge an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under Section 781. SECTION 1. Section 781.1 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: ### SECTION 1. 781.1. A superior court or probation department shall not charge an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under Section 781. 781.1. A superior court or probation department shall not charge an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under Section 781. 781.1. A superior court or probation department shall not charge an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under Section 781. 781.1. A superior court or probation department shall not charge an applicant a fee for filing a petition to seal records under Section 781. SEC. 2. Section 903.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 903.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed. ### SEC. 2.