|
09/06/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2833.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1617.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1564.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|