California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB309 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2019

Amended

Bill July 2, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill May 9, 2019