|
06/26/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 11, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1608.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1405.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|