California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2019

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2019

Amended

Bill March 27, 2019
Bill March 11, 2019