|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3507.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2806.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 2. Page 1618.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|