California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB506 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill June 18, 2019
Bill June 3, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019