|
10/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 708, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 3553.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 2913.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 4. Page 1869.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|