California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB539 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2019

Amended

Bill September 4, 2019
Bill August 20, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019