California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB908 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2020

Amended

Bill August 1, 2020
Bill July 22, 2020
Bill June 29, 2020
Bill January 7, 2020
Bill April 29, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019