LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR36
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR36
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR36
Action History
Assembly
05/29/2019
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
Assembly
05/24/2019
Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Assembly
05/21/2019
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20).
Assembly
05/16/2019
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
05/07/2019
Introduced.