Assembly | 07/27/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2020 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2020 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2020 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2020 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3623.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2020 | Set for hearing May 29. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |