Amended IN Assembly July 13, 2020 Amended IN Senate May 19, 2020 Amended IN Senate April 17, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1373Introduced by Senator Bates(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Brough)February 21, 2020An act to amend Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1373, as amended, Bates. State highways: State Route 241: reduction.Existing law establishes the state highway system throughout the state and designates State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to State Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.This bill would delete from the state highway system the portion of State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read:541. (a) Route 241 is from Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo to Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.(b) Nothing in subdivision (a) shall prohibit any member of the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, or any successor agency, from requiring the payment of a fee established before January 1, 2020, under subdivision (a) of Section 66484.3 of the Government Code. Amended IN Assembly July 13, 2020 Amended IN Senate May 19, 2020 Amended IN Senate April 17, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1373Introduced by Senator Bates(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Brough)February 21, 2020An act to amend Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1373, as amended, Bates. State highways: State Route 241: reduction.Existing law establishes the state highway system throughout the state and designates State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to State Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.This bill would delete from the state highway system the portion of State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo. Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Amended IN Assembly July 13, 2020 Amended IN Senate May 19, 2020 Amended IN Senate April 17, 2020 Amended IN Assembly July 13, 2020 Amended IN Senate May 19, 2020 Amended IN Senate April 17, 2020 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1373 Introduced by Senator Bates(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Brough)February 21, 2020 Introduced by Senator Bates(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Brough) February 21, 2020 An act to amend Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1373, as amended, Bates. State highways: State Route 241: reduction. Existing law establishes the state highway system throughout the state and designates State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to State Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.This bill would delete from the state highway system the portion of State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo. Existing law establishes the state highway system throughout the state and designates State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to State Route 91 in the City of Anaheim. This bill would delete from the state highway system the portion of State Route 241 from State Route 5 south of the City of San Clemente to Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read:541. (a) Route 241 is from Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo to Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.(b) Nothing in subdivision (a) shall prohibit any member of the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, or any successor agency, from requiring the payment of a fee established before January 1, 2020, under subdivision (a) of Section 66484.3 of the Government Code. The people of the State of California do enact as follows: ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows: SECTION 1. Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read:541. (a) Route 241 is from Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo to Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.(b) Nothing in subdivision (a) shall prohibit any member of the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, or any successor agency, from requiring the payment of a fee established before January 1, 2020, under subdivision (a) of Section 66484.3 of the Government Code. SECTION 1. Section 541 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: ### SECTION 1. 541. (a) Route 241 is from Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo to Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.(b) Nothing in subdivision (a) shall prohibit any member of the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, or any successor agency, from requiring the payment of a fee established before January 1, 2020, under subdivision (a) of Section 66484.3 of the Government Code. 541. (a) Route 241 is from Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo to Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.(b) Nothing in subdivision (a) shall prohibit any member of the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, or any successor agency, from requiring the payment of a fee established before January 1, 2020, under subdivision (a) of Section 66484.3 of the Government Code. 541. (a) Route 241 is from Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo to Route 91 in the City of Anaheim.(b) Nothing in subdivision (a) shall prohibit any member of the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, or any successor agency, from requiring the payment of a fee established before January 1, 2020, under subdivision (a) of Section 66484.3 of the Government Code. 541. (a) Route 241 is from Oso Parkway east of the City of Mission Viejo to Route 91 in the City of Anaheim. (b) Nothing in subdivision (a) shall prohibit any member of the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, the Foothill/Eastern Transportation Corridor Agency, or any successor agency, from requiring the payment of a fee established before January 1, 2020, under subdivision (a) of Section 66484.3 of the Government Code.