|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3264.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
June 17 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1210.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1097.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 903.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|