California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Amended

Bill September 5, 2019
Bill June 24, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019