Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 2. Page 3153.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3141.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2020
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3099.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2020
|
Set for hearing January 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|