California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Amended

Bill July 27, 2020
Bill January 21, 2020
Bill January 6, 2020
Bill September 6, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019