|
09/29/2020
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 20. Page 5230.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (July 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 3797.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3613.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2020
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|