California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB972 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Amended

Bill July 28, 2020
Bill June 15, 2020
Bill May 29, 2020
Bill March 25, 2020