|
10/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 2742.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2284.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 1739.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|