California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1084 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2021

Amended

Bill July 1, 2021
Bill June 21, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021