|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 927, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5062.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3372.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 3365.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|