California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1187 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022