LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1779
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1779
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1779
Action History
Assembly
04/26/2022
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/19/2022
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Assembly
02/10/2022
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and B. & P.
Assembly
02/04/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
Assembly
02/03/2022
Read first time. To print.