Assembly
|
09/13/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 3.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4992.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4991.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wiener.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4990.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 4969.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|