California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1879 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/26/2022

                            Enrolled  August 26, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 30, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  April 21, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1879Introduced by Assembly Member MathisFebruary 08, 2022An act to add Section 13228.20 to the Water Code, relating to water quality. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1879, Mathis. California regional water quality control boards: unfounded or frivolous complaints.Under existing law, the State Water Resources Control Board and the California regional water quality control boards implement the Federal Water Pollution Control Act and the Porter-Cologne Water Quality Control Act by prescribing waste discharge requirements for discharges to the waters of the state, as specified. Existing law authorizes the state board and the regional boards to hold hearings necessary for carrying out their duties, as specified.This bill would authorize a regional board to develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 13228.20 is added to the Water Code, to read:13228.20. A regional board may develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.

 Enrolled  August 26, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 30, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  April 21, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1879Introduced by Assembly Member MathisFebruary 08, 2022An act to add Section 13228.20 to the Water Code, relating to water quality. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1879, Mathis. California regional water quality control boards: unfounded or frivolous complaints.Under existing law, the State Water Resources Control Board and the California regional water quality control boards implement the Federal Water Pollution Control Act and the Porter-Cologne Water Quality Control Act by prescribing waste discharge requirements for discharges to the waters of the state, as specified. Existing law authorizes the state board and the regional boards to hold hearings necessary for carrying out their duties, as specified.This bill would authorize a regional board to develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 26, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  June 30, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  April 21, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022

Enrolled  August 26, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 24, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  June 30, 2022
Amended IN  Assembly  April 21, 2022
Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2022

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 1879

Introduced by Assembly Member MathisFebruary 08, 2022

Introduced by Assembly Member Mathis
February 08, 2022

An act to add Section 13228.20 to the Water Code, relating to water quality. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1879, Mathis. California regional water quality control boards: unfounded or frivolous complaints.

Under existing law, the State Water Resources Control Board and the California regional water quality control boards implement the Federal Water Pollution Control Act and the Porter-Cologne Water Quality Control Act by prescribing waste discharge requirements for discharges to the waters of the state, as specified. Existing law authorizes the state board and the regional boards to hold hearings necessary for carrying out their duties, as specified.This bill would authorize a regional board to develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.

Under existing law, the State Water Resources Control Board and the California regional water quality control boards implement the Federal Water Pollution Control Act and the Porter-Cologne Water Quality Control Act by prescribing waste discharge requirements for discharges to the waters of the state, as specified. Existing law authorizes the state board and the regional boards to hold hearings necessary for carrying out their duties, as specified.

This bill would authorize a regional board to develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 13228.20 is added to the Water Code, to read:13228.20. A regional board may develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 13228.20 is added to the Water Code, to read:13228.20. A regional board may develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.

SECTION 1. Section 13228.20 is added to the Water Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

13228.20. A regional board may develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.

13228.20. A regional board may develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.

13228.20. A regional board may develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.



13228.20. A regional board may develop a plan or policy to address unfounded or frivolous complaints.