California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1879 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022