|
07/19/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4264.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4468.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|