California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 19, 2022

Amended

Bill June 9, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022