|
07/21/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4432.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3434.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|