California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2022

Amended

Bill January 24, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022