|
08/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4685.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5026.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|