California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 9, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill May 5, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022