Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 10.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5244.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 10. Page 5244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 4863.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|