California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Amended

Bill August 24, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022