|
08/31/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2465.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2072.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1715.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1584.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|