California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2021

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2021

Amended

Bill July 1, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021