|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5173.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 3398.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2022
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Rodriguez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Rodriguez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|