California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB551 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 551 CHAPTER 741An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement. [ Approved by Governor September 29, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State September 29, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.
1+Enrolled September 02, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 29, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 31, 2022 Amended IN Senate June 28, 2022 Amended IN Senate May 09, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 551Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezFebruary 10, 2021An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 551 CHAPTER 741An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement. [ Approved by Governor September 29, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State September 29, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled September 02, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 29, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 31, 2022 Amended IN Senate June 28, 2022 Amended IN Senate May 09, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 551Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezFebruary 10, 2021An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
44
5- Assembly Bill No. 551 CHAPTER 741
5+ Enrolled September 02, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 29, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 31, 2022 Amended IN Senate June 28, 2022 Amended IN Senate May 09, 2022
66
7- Assembly Bill No. 551
7+Enrolled September 02, 2022
8+Passed IN Senate August 29, 2022
9+Passed IN Assembly August 31, 2022
10+Amended IN Senate June 28, 2022
11+Amended IN Senate May 09, 2022
812
9- CHAPTER 741
13+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION
14+
15+ Assembly Bill
16+
17+No. 551
18+
19+Introduced by Assembly Member RodriguezFebruary 10, 2021
20+
21+Introduced by Assembly Member Rodriguez
22+February 10, 2021
1023
1124 An act to amend Section 7523.2 of the Government Code, relating to retirement.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor September 29, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State September 29, 2022. ]
1425
1526 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1627
1728 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1829
1930 AB 551, Rodriguez. Disability retirement: COVID-19: presumption.
2031
2132 Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted. This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.
2233
2334 Existing law, until January 1, 2023, establishes a disability retirement presumption that is applicable to the members of various public employee retirement systems who are employed in certain firefighter, public safety officer, and health care job classifications, among others, who test positive for COVID-19, as specified. Existing law requires, if the member retires for disability on the basis, in whole or in part, of a COVID-19-related illness, that it be presumed that the disability arose out of, or in the course of, the members employment, unless rebutted.
2435
2536 This bill would extend the operation of the provisions described above until January 1, 2024.
2637
2738 ## Digest Key
2839
2940 ## Bill Text
3041
3142 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.
3243
3344 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3445
3546 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3647
3748 SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.
3849
3950 SECTION 1. Section 7523.2 of the Government Code is amended to read:
4051
4152 ### SECTION 1.
4253
4354 7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.
4455
4556 7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.
4657
4758 7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.
4859
4960
5061
5162 7523.2. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2024, and as of that date is repealed.