California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 28, 2022
Bill May 9, 2022