|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 5363.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|