California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill May 23, 2022