|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 482, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2071.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2407.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1044.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|