California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill June 28, 2021
Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021