Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2021
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2589.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 2894.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 2784.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1377.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1201.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 937.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|