California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill July 1, 2021
Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021