California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Amended

Bill June 5, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023