|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 3372.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3135.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2392.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1009.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|